Financial history EAST MIDLANDS MUSEUMS SERVICE

Charity Number: 1009683
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019
Total gross income £98.76k £130.24k £87.09k £29.30k £882
Total expenditure £93.28k £129.18k £82.76k £49.15k £165
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A