Governing document HITCHIN BRITISH SCHOOLS TRUST

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 4 NOVEMBER 1991 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 26 MARCH 1992, 2 NOVEMBER 2003, 6 NOVEMBER 2005 AND 10 MARCH 2008 as amended on 11 Mar 2017
Charitable objects
(I) TO PRESERVE A HISTORICALLY IMPORTANT GROUP OF BUILDINGS IN HITCHIN, HERTFORDSHIRE, KNOWN AS THE BRITISH SCHOOLS (II) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE HISTORY OF SCHOOLING BY: (A) PRESERVING AND ENHANCING THE COLLECTION OF ARTEFACTS RELATING TO THE HISTORY OF ELEMENTARY EDUCATION AND SOCIAL HISTORY OF CHILDREN (B) PRESENTING THESE BUILDINGS AND COLLECTION AS A MUSEUM OF ELEMENTARY EDUCATION AND CHILDHOOD (C) DELIVERING A LIVING EXPERIENCE OF HISTORIC SCHOOLDAYS TO ALL
Area of benefit
HITCHIN
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.