Financial history THE FRANCES WOOD CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity Number: 1010851
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2004 31/03/2005 31/03/2006 31/03/2007 31/03/2008
Total gross income £4.19k £3.76k £1.29k £717 £14
Total expenditure £32.00k £70.02k £8.57k £15.34k £22.40k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A