Financial history ROMANIAN CHALLENGE APPEAL

Charity number: 1011397
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £17.12k £18.67k £40.38k £22.34k £19.28k
Total expenditure £21.95k £24.21k £21.15k £28.87k £18.78k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A