Accounts and annual returns LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF THE BRON-Y-GARTH HOSPITAL

Charity number: 1011664
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 31 October 2008 21 May 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2008 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2007 02 October 2008 32 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2007 24 June 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 October 2006 25 January 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2006 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2005 30 December 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2005 Not Required