Financial history LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF THE BRON-Y-GARTH HOSPITAL

Charity number: 1011664
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2004 31/10/2005 31/10/2006 31/10/2007 31/10/2008
Total gross income £6.49k £4.58k £4.32k £293.30k £3.26k
Total expenditure £10.31k £1.97k £802 £80.00k £3.55k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A