Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF PRIORSLEGH GROUP MEDICAL PRACTICE

Charity Number: 1012183
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 04 October 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 10 January 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2015 20 August 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2014 14 August 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014 Not Required