Financial history FRIENDS OF PRIORSLEGH GROUP MEDICAL PRACTICE

Charity Number: 1012183
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2013 31/03/2014 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017
Total gross income £35.62k £12.63k £525 £534 £316
Total expenditure £3.00k £35.70k £4.27k £234 £8.06k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A