Accounts and annual returns SOUTHBOROUGH PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1012305
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2022 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2021 30 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 30 June 2022 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2020 17 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 17 June 2021 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2019 10 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 02 July 2020 2 days late