Financial history SOUTHBOROUGH PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1012305
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £99.96k £99.96k £107.03k £90.01k £112.73k
Total expenditure £103.97k £103.79k £98.20k £94.15k £102.77k
Income from government contracts £67.83k N/A £84.14k N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £73.07k £90.97k