Accounts and annual returns THE PAUL REILLY DESIGN LECTURE TRUST

Charity number: 1012828
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2008 17 November 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2007 09 October 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2006 09 February 2007 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2005 07 November 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2004 07 September 2004 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2004 Not Required