Accounts and annual returns BURRY PORT INFANT SCHOOL PARENTS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1013028
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 02 October 2014 15 July 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 02 October 2014 Not Required
Annual return 02 October 2013 24 July 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 02 October 2013 Not Required
Annual return 02 October 2012 04 August 2013 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 02 October 2012 Not Required
Annual return 02 October 2011 18 September 2012 47 days late
Accounts and TAR 02 October 2011 Not Required