Financial history BURRY PORT INFANT SCHOOL PARENTS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1013028
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 02/10/2010 02/10/2011 02/10/2012 02/10/2013 02/10/2014
Total gross income £1.56k £2.17k £799 £1.09k £500
Total expenditure £1.37k £2.25k £218 £1.91k £556
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A