Accounts and annual returns THE SWAN CLUB

Charity number: 1014344
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2015 14 May 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2014 22 September 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2013 16 September 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2012 17 June 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 Not Required