Financial history THE SWAN CLUB

Charity number: 1014344
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2011 31/03/2012 31/03/2013 31/03/2014 31/03/2015
Total gross income £5.77k £5.78k £5.85k £5.68k £111
Total expenditure £5.67k £5.96k £6.74k £4.97k £4.12k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A