Financial history ORPHAN AID ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1014616
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £12.18k £15.07k £17.24k £15.77k £18.82k
Total expenditure £7.44k £9.19k £12.31k £8.37k £11.38k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A