Financial history THE LONDON PRINTWORKS TRUST

Charity Number: 1014895
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2008 31/03/2009 31/03/2010 31/03/2011 31/03/2012
Total gross income £239.56k £247.65k £262.49k £265.59k £222.82k
Total expenditure £251.73k £245.58k £258.68k £287.88k £279.68k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A