Accounts and annual returns CHATWIN TRUST

Charity number: 1015633
Charity reporting is up to date (47 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 04 April 2024 23 March 2025 47 days late
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 04 April 2023 30 December 2024 330 days late
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 04 April 2022 05 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2022 05 November 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 04 April 2021 28 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 04 April 2020 12 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2020 12 July 2020 On Time Download Open in new window