Financial history CHATWIN TRUST

Charity number: 1015633
Charity reporting is up to date (47 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 04/04/2020 04/04/2021 04/04/2022 04/04/2023 04/04/2024
Total gross income £25.79k £20.30k £25.40k £21.78k £23.03k
Total expenditure £26.05k £21.00k £30.30k £27.78k £23.50k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A