Accounts and annual returns THANINGTON WITHOUT WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity Number: 1017739
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2008 19 February 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2008 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2007 27 February 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2007 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2006 17 January 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2006 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2005 20 April 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2005 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2004 08 December 2004 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2004 Not Required