Financial history THANINGTON WITHOUT WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity Number: 1017739
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2004 30/09/2005 30/09/2006 30/09/2007 30/09/2008
Total gross income £2.18k £2.45k £2.25k £1.45k £2.40k
Total expenditure £2.37k £3.08k £2.24k £1.54k £2.67k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A