Accounts and annual returns BINLEY WOODS WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity Number: 1018162
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2008 10 May 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2008 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2007 15 August 2008 16 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2007 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2006 16 February 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2006 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2005 21 March 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2005 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2004 12 May 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2004 Not Required