Financial history BINLEY WOODS WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity number: 1018162
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2004 30/09/2005 30/09/2006 30/09/2007 30/09/2008
Total gross income £1.06k £1.25k £1.30k £1.57k £1.92k
Total expenditure £962 £1.17k £1.17k £1.26k £1.48k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A