Accounts and annual returns HIGHFIELD COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 1018758

Charity reporting is up to date (3 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 03 February 2025 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 03 February 2025 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 05 July 2024 | 156 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 05 July 2024 | 156 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 05 July 2024 | 521 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 05 July 2024 | 521 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 03 October 2023 | 610 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2021
(These accounts |
03 October 2023 | 610 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 17 May 2023 | 836 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2020
(These accounts |
17 May 2023 | 836 days late | Download Open in new window |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window