Trustees HIGHFIELD COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1018758
Charity reporting is up to date (3 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
John Stopps Trustee 27 March 2024
None on record
Gemma Cole Trustee 27 March 2024
None on record
Kelly Delaney Trustee 27 March 2024
None on record
Gareth Hamm Trustee 27 March 2024
None on record
Joely Fletcher Trustee 27 March 2024
None on record
Christopher Stuart Trustee 26 March 2024
None on record
Rebecca Koobi Trustee 02 April 2023
None on record
Sammy Barry-Mears Trustee 02 April 2023
None on record
Brenda Link Trustee 02 April 2023
None on record
Wayne Cole Trustee 03 March 2019
None on record
Margret Gogin Trustee 03 March 2018
None on record