Accounts and annual returns HATFIELD BROAD OAK WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity Number: 1019703
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 19 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2023 02 October 2024 216 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2022 21 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2021 13 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 08 February 2021 100 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required