Financial history HATFIELD BROAD OAK WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity Number: 1019703
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 31/12/2023
Total gross income £3.02k £1.14k £15.78k £17.64k £2.48k
Total expenditure £3.33k £656 £6.67k £12.83k £4.67k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £12.00k N/A N/A