Trustees WESSEX COMMUNITY ACTION

Charity Number: 1019716
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Ian Giles Phillips Chair 04 April 2017
None on record
Beverly Vanterpool Trustee 24 February 2025
None on record
Suzanne Catherine Tarplee Trustee 11 March 2024
None on record
Melanie Monaghan Trustee 15 January 2024
None on record
Dr Angela Louise Turner-Wilson Trustee 15 January 2024
None on record
Marinda Houlden Trustee 19 September 2022
None on record
Anna Dumas Trustee 18 July 2022
None on record
NORMAN BARTER Trustee
None on record