Accounts and annual returns SHELDWICH COUNTY PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1021211
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 18 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2023 20 September 2024 82 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 20 September 2024 448 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 12 September 2024 805 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 25 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required