Financial history SHELDWICH COUNTY PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1021211
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £6.49k £3.49k £13.82k £9.08k £14.57k
Total expenditure £3.30k £2.87k £11.83k £6.44k £12.62k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A