Financial history FRIENDS OF ASHLEY SCHOOL

Charity number: 1024028
Charity reporting is up to date (128 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £43.04k £30.68k £17.65k £29.15k £27.47k
Total expenditure £14.82k £12.61k £44.34k £51.11k £6.32k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A