Financial history STEPPING STONES PRE SCHOOL (READING)

Charity number: 1024885
Charity reporting is up to date (88 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £210.34k £243.47k £215.38k £270.60k £191.66k
Total expenditure £177.32k £184.07k £207.68k £276.85k £159.68k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £500 £2.50k