Accounts and annual returns SOUTHMOOR PRESCHOOL

Charity Number: 1025896
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2018 09 May 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 09 May 2019 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2017 18 September 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 18 September 2018 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2016 05 July 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

05 July 2017 On Time