Financial history SOUTHMOOR PRESCHOOL

Charity number: 1025896
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2014 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018
Total gross income £75.52k £78.11k £81.22k £100.37k £32.99k
Total expenditure £76.16k £75.44k £78.54k £81.34k £26.27k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 £60.18k £62.28k N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 £0 £6.47k N/A