Trustees NATIONAL COUNCIL FOR THE TRAINING OF JOURNALISTS
Charity number: 1026685

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John McAndrew | Trustee | 06 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Alexander Martin | Trustee | 06 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Veronica Kan-Dapaah | Trustee | 06 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Susan Brooks | Trustee | 11 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paul Sinker | Trustee | 22 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mark Alford | Trustee | 14 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Alison Johnson | Trustee | 21 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alan Edmunds | Trustee | 28 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Neil Patrick O'Brien | Trustee | 12 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Webster | Trustee | 12 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Toby Leon Granville | Trustee | 07 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Martin Wright | Trustee | 27 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
JOHN HAMILTON RYLEY | Trustee | 20 April 2011 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.