Financial history LITTLE SNORING PLAYGROUP

Charity number: 1027145
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2016 31/05/2017 31/05/2018 31/05/2019 31/05/2020
Total gross income £59.02k £51.45k £50.07k £57.26k £49.42k
Total expenditure £54.64k £41.60k £49.80k £43.23k £52.69k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A