Accounts and annual returns KILMINGTON PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1027578
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2017 11 May 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2016 27 May 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

27 May 2017 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2015 30 June 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2015 30 June 2016 On Time