Financial history KILMINGTON PRE-SCHOOL

Charity Number: 1027578
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2013 31/08/2014 31/08/2015 31/08/2016 31/08/2017
Total gross income £19.72k £33.11k £31.68k £32.51k £22.67k
Total expenditure £25.93k £29.46k £29.69k £30.19k £30.62k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £28.85k £0 £22.54k
Income from government grants N/A N/A £0 £29.36k £0