Accounts and annual returns SMARDEN PRE-SCHOOL

Charity Number: 1027605
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 29 April 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 29 April 2018 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2016 27 April 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

27 April 2017 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2015 24 May 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2015

(These accounts
have been qualified)

24 May 2016 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2014 15 May 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2014 15 May 2015 On Time