Financial history SMARDEN PRE-SCHOOL

Charity Number: 1027605
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2013 31/08/2014 31/08/2015 31/08/2016 31/08/2017
Total gross income £57.53k £50.69k £62.40k £59.61k £66.24k
Total expenditure £52.98k £45.76k £55.91k £56.49k £55.77k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £30.96k £43.10k £42.08k
Income from government grants N/A N/A £600 £0 £900