Accounts and annual returns ROMAN BUILDING TRUST

Charity number: 1028436
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 12 July 2014 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 12 July 2014 Not submitted
Annual return 12 July 2013 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 12 July 2013 Not submitted
Annual return 12 July 2012 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 12 July 2012 Not submitted
Annual return 12 July 2011 24 February 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 12 July 2011 Not Required