Financial history ROMAN BUILDING TRUST

Charity number: 1028436
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 12/07/2007 12/07/2008 12/07/2009 12/07/2010 12/07/2011
Total gross income £169 £0 £134 £6 £6
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A