Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF SYRESHAM SCHOOL

Charity Number: 1030877
Charity reporting is up to date (81 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 19 September 2024 81 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 15 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 10 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2020 13 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2019 18 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 Not Required