Financial history FRIENDS OF SYRESHAM SCHOOL

Charity Number: 1030877
Charity reporting is up to date (81 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2019 31/10/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £15.68k £9.10k £6.17k £12.47k £16.80k
Total expenditure £13.49k £13.14k £6.05k £8.55k £13.69k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A