Accounts and annual returns BISHOP RAWSTORNE CHURCH OF ENGLAND LANGUAGE COLLEGE PARENT TEACHER AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1031300
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2013 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2013 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2012 19 December 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2012 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2011 19 December 2012 172 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2011 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2010 27 June 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2010 Not Required