Financial history BISHOP RAWSTORNE CHURCH OF ENGLAND LANGUAGE COLLEGE PARENT TEACHER AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1031300
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2008 31/08/2009 31/08/2010 31/08/2011 31/08/2012
Total gross income £5.25k £4.74k £2.87k £6.28k £108
Total expenditure £561 £12.77k £104 £4.63k £9.47k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A