Accounts and annual returns THE CRYPT PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1031570
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 16 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 16 May 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 30 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 30 June 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 11 July 2022 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 11 July 2022 11 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 03 March 2022 246 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 03 March 2022 246 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 19 October 2020 111 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 19 October 2020 111 days late Download Open in new window