Financial history THE CRYPT PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1031570
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £67.09k £135.35k £63.98k £65.98k £75.11k
Total expenditure £77.69k £137.98k £74.38k £68.77k £71.13k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £53.77k N/A N/A
Income from government grants £53.45k £112.50k N/A £57.22k £60.26k