Financial history FIRST STEPS PRESCHOOL (ROCESTER)

Charity number: 1031804
Charity reporting is up to date (288 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £149.59k £157.93k £144.37k £121.88k £86.47k
Total expenditure £151.65k £151.84k £163.53k £119.75k £89.85k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £94.02k £114.38k £109.52k £79.51k £41.72k