Accounts and annual returns GWEEK SEALS UNDER 5'S

Charity number: 1032128
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 23 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2023 22 September 2024 84 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 28 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 22 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 15 November 2021 138 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required